Cintas board members
WebApr 1, 2024 · The company said its Board elected Todd Schneider as Chief Executive Officer & President and a Director of the company, effective June 1, 2024. The Board of … WebApr 8, 2024 · Cintas Corporation CEO and Chairman Scott Farmer (left) will retire as CEO on May 31, 2024 after 18 years in the role and 40 years at the company. He will be succeeded as CEO by Todd M. Schneider (right), the company’s current Executive Vice President and Chief Operating Officer, on June 1, 2024.
Cintas board members
Did you know?
WebOn behalf of the Board of Directors (the Board) and employee-partners of Cintas Corporation (the Company), I invite you to attend our Annual Meeting of Shareholders (Annual Meeting) on October 27, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Daylight Time. This year’s Annual Meeting will be a virtual meeting of shareholders. WebCintas has 8 board members and advisors, including James Johnson. James Johnson Board Member. Joseph Scaminace Board Member. John Barrett Board Member. Ronald …
Web2 days ago · An independent member of Cintas’ Board, Mucci will serve on the Audit Committee and the Nominating and Corporate Governance Committee. In addition to Paychex’s Board, on which he has served since 2010, Mucci also sits on the Board of NCR Corporation, which provides digital consulting services and products to connected … WebOn behalf of the Board of Directors (the Board) and employee-partners of Cintas Corporation (the Company), I invite you to attend our Annual Meeting of Shareholders (Annual Meeting) on October 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Eastern Daylight Time. This year’s Annual Meeting will be a virtual meeting of shareholders.
WebShe served as a management board member on numerous Johnson & Johnson operating company boards from 1997 to 2009, including Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Ethicon Endo Surgery and Johnson & Johnson Medical. ... Cintas' Board of Directors approved a change in dividend policy from an annual dividend to quarterly dividends. All … WebBoard Members Robert Angelico President & Managing Partner Liskow & Lewis Joe Arroyo President Fire Extinguisher & Supply Company, Inc. David Aubrey VP of External Affairs AT&T Louisiana Scott Ballard, Treasurer Founder Ballard Brands Bobby Barousse Chief Financial Officer Elmer Candy Corporation Bob Barton Managing Partner Taylor Porter
WebApr 1, 2024 · Cintas Corp. Chairman Scott D. Farmer (left) retired as CEO on May 31 after 18 years in the role and 40 years with the company. He was succeeded as CEO by Todd M. Schneider (right) on June 1. (Photo Credit: Cintas Corp.) Cintas Corp., Mason, OH, today announced that Scott Farmer, Cintas’ chairman & CEO, will retire as CEO on May 31.
WebInvestors. Cintas is committed to providing a safe, healthy, and inclusive work environment, sustainable products and services and care for the communities in which we do business. Management and Directors. … did jasper texas weather this weekWebCintas employee-partners are guided by long-standing social and governance principles. High ethical and moral values, diversity and inclusion, world-class health and safety standards, and responsible policies and practices are all at the heart of how we do business. did jasper jones win any awardsWebNov 18, 2024 · Todd Schneider is a President & COO at CINTAS CORP. Joseph M. Scaminace Board Member John F. Barrett Board Member Gerald S. Adolph Board … did jason williams win a championshipWebApr 1, 2024 · Contact: Michelle Goret Vice President of Corporate Affairs 513-972-4155 [email protected] Paul F. Adler Vice President - Treasurer & Investor Relations 513-972-4195 [email protected] J. Michael Hansen Executive Vice President & Chief Financial Officer 513-972-2079 [email protected] did jason todd have red hairWebBoard members at this company. John F. Barrett. Gerald S. Adolph. Joseph Scaminace. Expand. As a member of Board of Directors at CINTAS CORP , John F. Barrett made … did jaws girlfriend have bracesWebThe independent Directors are Joseph J. Echevarria, Philip Giordano, Jesse A. Lynn, Scott Letier, Nichelle Maynard-Elliott, Steven Miller, James Nelson and Margarita Paláu-Hernández. Steve Bandrowczak, our Chief Executive Officer, … did javicia leslie leave the family businessWebApr 1, 2024 · Scott D. Farmer will retire as CEO of Cintas Corporation (NASDAQ:CTAS) on May 31, 2024, and remain on as Executive Chairman of the Board. He has been a … did jax cheat on stassi